Danelice, Michele Marie (CPSO#: 66983)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 18 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 05 Oct 1997
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 06 Oct 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Sep 1998
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 21 Oct 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jun 2000