Daneman, Denis (CPSO#: 28953)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Aug 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital For Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6122
Fax: (416) 813-7479
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 23 May 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 04 Sep 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DENIS DANEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANEMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Nov 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1981