Dang, Phuong Lieu Lam (CPSO#: 70448)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Vietnamese

Education:University of Alberta, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
170 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 3A8
Phone: (905) 276-2599
Fax: (905) 276-7066
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Phuong Dang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Dang ( CPSO# 70448 )

Business Address:
208 - 170 Queensway Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5B 3A8
Phone Number: (905) 276-2599

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHUONG LIEU LAM DANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 02 Aug 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 03 Aug 1997 to 02 Feb 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 03 Feb 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999