Dang, Surrinder Paul Singh (CPSO#: 50354)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Jul 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 24 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jul 2007