Danial, Bahauddin Hasan (CPSO#: 52374)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 May 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 May 1983

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Osmania University, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brandongate Medical Clinic
Unit 6
4025 Brandongate Drive
Mississauga ON  L4T 3Z9
Phone: (905) 678-2831
Fax: (905) 678-1515
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1530
albion rd
Rexdale ON  M4V 1B4
Canada
Phone: (416) 744-3019
Fax: (416) 744-6560
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.BH Danial Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 12 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Danial ( CPSO# 52374 )

Business Address:
6 - 4025 Brandongate Drive
Mississauga ON  L4T 3Z9
Phone Number: (905) 678-2831

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BAHAUDDIN HASAN DANIAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANIAL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 1983

Concerns

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: September 29, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

Where the Quality Assurance Committee has made a decision on or after June 1, 2016 in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”), the College By-laws require that the elements of the SCERP be posted on the register. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the Quality Assurance Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

On September 29, 2016, the Quality Assurance Committee (“QAC”) required, Dr. Danial to complete a specified continuing education and remediation program (“SCERP”). The SCERP requires Dr. Danial to:

• Implement the general principles of what was learned in the Medical Record Keeping Course;
• Provide a written summary of the following policies/guidelines:
o CPSO Medical Records Policy;
o CMPA resources for EMR;
o Screening Guidelines for Cervical Breast and Colon Cancer from Cancer Care Ontario’s Screen for Life;
o Canadian Taskforce on Preventative Care – Osteoporosis;
o CPSO Confidentiality Policy;

• Review, familiarize, and implement the following policies/guidelines:
o Choosing Wisely Campaign;
o Canadian Guideline for Safe and Effective Use of Opioids for Chronic Non-Cancer Pain: o CDC Guideline for Prescribing Opioids for Chronic Pain;
o Diabetes Guidelines;
o Hypertension Guidelines;
o Depression Guidelines;
o Immunization Schedule;
o Thyroid Guidelines;
o Anti-infective Guidelines for Community-Acquired Infections;

• Practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for twelve months;

• Undergo a reassessment with an assessor selected by the College,
approximately six months following the completion of the education program.