Danial, Jacob (CPSO#: 23788)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Christian Medical College, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 01 Jan 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1966
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jul 2008