Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Daniel, Arkadiusz Mieczyslaw (CPSO#: 70011)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4456 Limebank Road, Unit 7
Ottawa ON  K1V 2N8
Phone: (613) 425-0588
Fax: (613) 692-0732
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1370 Clyde Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2G 3H8
Canada
Phone: (613) 727-1072
Fax: (613) 727-5873
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Arkadiusz Daniel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 31 2010


Corporation Name: Dr. A.M. Daniel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Daniel ( CPSO# 70011 )

Business Address:
1370 Clyde Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2G 3H8
Phone Number: (613) 727-1072

Business Address:
4456 Limebank Road
Suite 7
Ottawa ON  K2G 3H8
Phone Number: (613) 425-0588

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARKADIUSZ MIECZYSLAW DANIEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANIEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1998