Daniel, Lorretta Bernice (CPSO#: 52376)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 May 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Room 4N 494
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-5174
Fax: (416) 340-4210
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lorretta Daniel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 10 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Daniel ( CPSO# 52376 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Room 4N-494
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-5174

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 28 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LORRETTA BERNICE DANIEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANIEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 1985