Daniel, Peter Edward (CPSO#: 58399)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
16 O'Brien Street
Suite 201
Orillia ON  L3V 5S2
Phone: (705) 326-4401
Fax: (705) 326-5212
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter E. Daniel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Daniel ( CPSO# 58399 )

Business Address:
201 - 16 O'Brien Street
Orillia ON  L3V 5S2
Phone Number: (705) 326-4401

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER EDWARD DANIEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANIEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1988