Daniel, Shaji P (CPSO#: 81791)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Kerala, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2004 to 08 Sep 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 09 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006