Daniel, Steven Llewellyn (CPSO#: 107115)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
City of Lakes Family Health Team
3400 Highway 144
Chelmsford ON  P0M 1L0
Phone: (705) 855-1018
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Steven L. Daniel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Daniel ( CPSO# 107115)

Business Address:
3400 Highway 144
Chelmsford ON  P0M 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 855-1018

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 30 May 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN LLEWELLYN DANIEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANIEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2017