Daniels, Nelson John (CPSO#: 20764)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jan 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jan 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: The Burnview Clinic Suite 100 3225 Lawrence Avenue East Scarborough ON M1H 3C2
Date Received: 17 Feb 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1967
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 May 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jan 2017

Concerns

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: January 28, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Nelson J. Daniels to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 28, 2017:

Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Daniels’s knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result, Dr. Daniels has resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)