Danielson, Kimberly Joy (CPSO#: 54649)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Mar 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Mar 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
302-110 Eglinton Ave W
Toronto ON  M4R 1A3
Phone: 647-547-0684
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIMBERLY JOY DANIELSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANIELSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Mar 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2018