Danjoux, Cyril Jean Evan (CPSO#: 27801)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew

Education:The Hebrew University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Odette Cancer Centre Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre 2075 Bayview Avenue M4N 3M5
Date Received: 24 Apr 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 04 Apr 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017