Danson, Alan Jeffrey (CPSO#: 28965)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 07 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1978 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 May 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 1998
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 07 Sep 2011