Danter, Matthew Robert (CPSO#: 99168)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 11 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew Danter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 20 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Miranda Rieger or Jerusha Latuff Administrative Assistants to Dr. R. Whitlock Hamilton General Hospital DBCVSRI C1-5B 237 Barton Street East Hamilton, ON L8L 2X2 Telephone: 905-527-4322 extension 40306 Fax: 905-577-8017 Email: miranda.rieger@phri.ca
Date Received: 25 Feb 2014

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New Mexico
USA - Tennessee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2012
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2016