Dao, Vi Vinh Bach (CPSO#: 82349)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 05 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 May 2005 to 01 Jun 2005
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Toronto, 10 Mar 2008 to 11 Apr 2008
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 06 Oct 2008 to 05 Oct 2009
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 May 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Oct 2009