Daoud, Wala Mohamed (CPSO#: 101091)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Winston Park Family Physicians
2315 Bristol Circle, Suite 104
Oakville ON  L6H 6P8
Phone: (905) 829-2826
Fax: (905) 829-2846
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wala Daoud Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 19 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Daoud ( CPSO# 101091)

Business Address:
Agnes Medical Clinic
3 - 25 Agnes Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 3X7
Phone Number: (905) 232-1160

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WALA MOHAMED DAOUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAOUD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016