Daoulah, Amin Nasim Mohamed (CPSO#: 72884)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jul 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 29 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 06 Jul 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 07 Jul 1999 to 06 Jul 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 07 Jul 2000 to 06 Jul 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 07 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2002 to 31 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Aug 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2007