Dar, Abdul Rashid (CPSO#: 42488)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Dec 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Jammu University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
WINDSOR
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Fax: (519) 254-2469
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Cancer Centre
2220 Kildare Road
Windsor ON  N8W 2X3
Canada
Phone: (519) 253-5253
Fax: (519) 255-8670
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Rashid Dar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 08 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dar ( CPSO# 42488 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 28 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDUL RASHID DAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1992