Dar, Shahnaz (CPSO#: 42540)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Oct 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Swahili, Urdu

Education:University of Nairobi, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1691 McCowan Road
Suite 201
Scarborough ON  M1S 2Y3
Phone: (416) 293-0275
Fax: (416) 293-8057
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 22 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAHNAZ DAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 1986