Daraei, Nemat Allah (CPSO#: 97189)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jan 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jan 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 106
210 Memorial Avenue
Orillia ON  L3V 7V1
Phone: (705) 327-6576
Fax: (705) 327-6579
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nemat Daraei Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Daraei ( CPSO# 97189 )

Business Address:
106 - 210 Memorial Avenue
Orillia ON  L3V 7V1
Phone Number: (705) 327-6576

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEMAT ALLAH DARAEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DARAEI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2012

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: February 18, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

As of August 10, 2016, all aspects of the SCERP have been fulfilled.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)