Darby, Padraig Liam (CPSO#: 42363)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Mar 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre for Addiction and
Mental Health
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 32702
Fax: (416) 583-4319
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. L. Darby Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Darby ( CPSO# 42363 )

Business Address:
Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 979-6876

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 19 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PADRAIG LIAM DARBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DARBY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 1990