Darcel, Ian Christopher (CPSO#: 50358)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Dec 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3155 Harvester Road
Apartment 408
Burlington ON  L7N 3V2
Phone: (905) 333-5077
Fax: (905) 333-5078
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: I.C. Darcel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 14 2014


Corporation Name: Dr. Ian Darcel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Darcel ( CPSO# 50358 )

Business Address:
Suite 408
3155 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3V2
Phone Number: (905) 333-5077

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 30 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN CHRISTOPHER DARCEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DARCEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 1986