Darcel, Keith Robert (CPSO#: 70850)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Calgary, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 1996 to 20 Oct 1996
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 10 Mar 1997 to 07 Apr 1997
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Sep 1997 to 30 Sep 1997
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Apr 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1997