Darrah, William Charles (CPSO#: 62972)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Aug 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 May 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5071
Fax: (416) 864-6014
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. William Darrah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 20 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Darrah ( CPSO# 62972 )

Business Address:
Dept of Anaesthesia
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5825

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 16 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM CHARLES DARRAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DARRAH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 1993