Daryawish, Marilyn (CPSO#: 25415)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jan 1973

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jan 1973

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, Assyrian, English, Persian

Education:University of Baghdad, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2-1160
beaverwood rd.
manotick on.
Manotick ON  K4M 1L6
Phone: (613) 692-0244
Fax: (613) 692-0258
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sargon B. Gandilo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gandilo ( CPSO# 32722 )
Dr. M. Daryawish ( CPSO# 25415 )

Business Address:
CML Kanata Health Imaging Centre
Suite 102
150 Katimavik Road
Ottawa ON  K2L 2N2

Business Address:
Nepean Imaging Centre
106 - 1 Centrepointe Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 6E2
Phone Number: (613) 723-5215

Business Address:
65 Larch Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 1B8

Business Address:
4456 Limebank Road
Gloucester ON  K1X 1E8
Phone Number: (613) 425-0588

Business Address:
B2 - 770 Boradview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2B 7K2

Business Address:
2246 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1V 1A4

Business Address:
2555 St Joseph Boulevard
Orleans ON  K1C 1S6


Corporation Name: Dr. Christina N. Gandilo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 28 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Gandilo ( CPSO# 94562 )
Dr. M. Daryawish ( CPSO# 25415 )

Business Address:
404 - 1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 1V3
Phone Number: (613) 728-1392

Business Address:
1194 Evans Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1H 7Z4


Corporation Name: Marilyn Daryawish Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 15 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Daryawish ( CPSO# 25415 )

Business Address:
Suite 2
1160 Beaverwood Road
Manotick ON  K4M 1L6
Phone Number: (613) 692-0244

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, Ontario M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-800-775-0093 Fax: (647) 933-2904 Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 11 Jul 2012

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARILYN DARYAWISH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DARYAWISH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1973