Darzins, Peteris Janis (CPSO#: 65865)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Geriatric Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997