Das, Amlan Kusum (CPSO#: 99955)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Hindi

Education:University of Calcutta, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amlan Das Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 10 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Das ( CPSO# 99955 )

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
90 Resolution Drive
Unit 2
Brampton ON  L6W 0A7
Phone Number: (416) 883-3877

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba
United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 03 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMLAN KUSUM DAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 Feb 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 27 Feb 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2017