Das, Debraj (CPSO#: 106208)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 09 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 22 Jun 2015 to 12 Jul 2015
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 13 Jul 2015 to 09 Aug 2015
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Aug 2015