Das, Paul Joy (CPSO#: 93381)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:Thomas Jefferson University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Centre at 80 Bond
80 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1X2
Phone: (416) 864-3011
Fax: (416) 864-3099
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa, ON
L1G 2B9
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: (905) 576-8711
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Das Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Das ( CPSO# 93381 )

Business Address:
Health Centre at 80 Bond
80 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1X2
Phone Number: (416) 864-3011

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL JOY DAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2012