Das Purkayastha, Pradip Kumar (CPSO#: 91983)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of London, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2009 to 19 Oct 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 20 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010