Das, Tilak (CPSO#: 99147)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Oxford University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 17 Sep 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 18 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013