Dasgupta, Angira (CPSO#: 96490)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Calcutta, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 13 Sep 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 14 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012