Daskalakis, Zafiris Jeffrey (CPSO#: 67989)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre for Addiction
and Mental Health
Unit 4
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 34319
Fax: (416) 583-1358
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daskalakis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Daskalakis ( CPSO# 67989 )

Business Address:
Care for Addiction and Mental Health
Unit 4-115A
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZAFIRIS JEFFREY DASKALAKIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DASKALAKIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999