Dath, Deepak P (CPSO#: 66434)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital & Cancer Centre
B3 - 155
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 43918
Fax: (905) 521-6048
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hamilton Regional Cancer Clinic
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Canada
Phone: (905) 387-9495 Ext. 63520
Fax: (905) 575-6331
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dath Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 12 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Dath ( CPSO# 66434 )

Business Address:
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 387-9495

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
711 Concession Street
Room B3-155
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Business Address:
St Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 521-6003

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEEPAK P DATH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DATH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 6 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998