Dattani, Dinubala (CPSO#: 32992)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:University of Bombay, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 02simba@rogers.com
Instructions: Please send medical record requests via e-mail to Dr. Dattani.
Date Received: 04 Jun 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2014