Daunt, Stephen William (CPSO#: 79539)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2810 Major Mackenzie Drive
Maple ON  L6A 1R8
Phone: (905) 832-3838
Fax: (905) 832-0793
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN WILLIAM DAUNT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAUNT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2005