Dauphin, Alezandre (CPSO#: 50360)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jan 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Creole, English, French

Education:University of Haiti, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33853
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alezandre Dauphin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dauphin ( CPSO# 50360 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 05 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEZANDRE DAUPHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAUPHIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1984