Dauphinee, Peter Alan (CPSO#: 69300)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 103
115 Bell Farm Road
Barrie ON  L4M 5G1
Phone: (705) 730-6850
Fax: (705) 726-1755
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter A. Dauphinee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Dauphinee ( CPSO# 69300 )

Business Address:
103 - 115 Bell Farm Road
Barrie ON  L4M 5G1
Phone Number: (705) 730-6850

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2

Business Address:
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Suite 102
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER ALAN DAUPHINEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAUPHINEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000