Dave, Kishorchandra Mayshanker (CPSO#: 28451)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:Gujarat University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
1615 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M6H 4H4
Phone: (416) 652-1990
Fax: (416) 652-1467
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1979 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KISHORCHANDRA MAYSHANKER DAVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1976