Dave, Malini Govind (CPSO#: 82838)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam, Tamil

Education:Nagpur University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 212
4800 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2J 2K9
Phone: (416) 497-1987
Fax: (416) 497-0712
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Black Creek Community Health Centre
2202 Jane Street Unit 5
Toronto ON  M3M 1A4
Canada
Phone: (416) 249-8000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Malini G. Dave Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dave ( CPSO# 82838 )

Business Address:
2202 Jane Street
North York ON  M3M 1A4
Phone Number: (416) 249-8000

Business Address:
401 - 4800 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2J 2K9
Phone Number: (416) 497-1987

Business Address:
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 953-1790

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 11 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MALINI GOVIND DAVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2009