Davey, Jean May Meiners (CPSO#: 20244)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1941

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Dec 1947 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1941
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Dec 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1999