Davey, Michelle Anne Labelle (CPSO#: 80770)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite E
530 Fred St
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone: (613) 239-2165
Fax: (613) 239-2167
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michelle Davey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Davey ( CPSO# 80770 )

Business Address:
North Dundas Medical Clinic
530 Fred Street
Suite E
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 239-2165

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE ANNE LABELLE DAVEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009