Davey, Phillip (CPSO#: 56557)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Manchester, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Odette Cancer Centre 2075 Bayview Avenue Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Date Received: 17 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 28 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016