David, Irving Bernard (CPSO#: 32055)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 02 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 24 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 1980
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002