Lawrence, David (CPSO#: 54066)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Oct 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN IMPACT
489 College St, Suite 304
Toronto ON  M6G 1A5
Phone: 416-603-5800 Ext. 8197
Fax: 416-925-0802
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

644 Richmond St West
Toronto ON  M6J 1C3
Canada
Phone: 416-603-4949
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID LAWRENCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAWRENCE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 1985