David, Tirone Esperidiao (CPSO#: 30513)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Dec 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Universidade Federal Do Parana, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
4N - 453
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-5062
Fax: (416) 340-4020
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIRONE ESPERIDIAO DAVID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVID is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Dec 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 1978