Davids, Jonathan William (CPSO#: 67872)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Presidents Choice Circle
Brampton ON  L6Y 5S5
Phone: (905) 861-2676
Fax: (905) 861-2363
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jonathan W. Davids Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 20 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN WILLIAM DAVIDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIDS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1996