Davidson, Carolyn Jane (CPSO#: 60652)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Mar 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Guelph
Student Health Services
50 Stone Road East
Guelph ON  N1G 2W1
Phone: (519) 824-4120 Ext. 52131
Fax: (519) 836-7431
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLYN JANE DAVIDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIDSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 1991